NH SB104 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-04 - Indefinitely Postpone (Rep. Almy): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2023 House Journal 13 P. 45
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-04 - Indefinitely Postpone (Rep. Almy): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2023 House Journal 13 P. 45
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
To regulate online gambling and direct net proceeds to a community college education scholarship fund.
Title
To regulate online gambling and direct net proceeds to a community college education scholarship fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Timothy Lang [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. William Gannon [R] | Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] |
Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Sen. Howard Pearl [R] | Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-30 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 12 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 11 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 12 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 11 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 11 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 12 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 11 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | House | Indefinitely Postpone (Rep. Almy): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2023 House Journal 13 P. 45 |
2023-04-27 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 04/26/2023 (Vote 20-0; Regular Calendar) |
2023-04-19 | House | Executive Session: 04/26/2023 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-04-19 | House | Public Hearing: 04/25/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-04-07 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 04/06/2023 and referred to Ways and Means |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-1145s, Regular Calendar 12Y-11N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/30/2023; Senate Journal 12 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Sen. Avard Moved Reconsideration on the vote on Ought to Pass as Amended, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/30/2023; Senate Journal 12 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-1145s, Regular Calendar 11Y-12N, Motion Failed; 03/30/2023; Senate Journal 12 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2023-1145s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/30/2023; Senate Journal 12 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-1145s, 03/30/2023; Senate Calendar 15 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0438s, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/22/2023; Senate Journal 8 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2023-0438s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/22/2023; Senate Journal 8 |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0438s, 02/22/2023; Senate Calendar 11 |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Hearing: 01/25/2023, Room 100, State House, 10:30 am; Senate Calendar 7 |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Introduced 01/05/2023 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 4 |