NH SB104 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on June 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-13 - II. Remainder Effective 08/07/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on June 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-13 - II. Remainder Effective 08/07/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to career and technical education.
Title
Relative to career and technical education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-13 | Senate | II. Remainder Effective 08/07/2017 |
2017-06-13 | Senate | I. Sections 8 and 10 of this act shall take effect as provided in Section 11 |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2017; Chapter 0110 |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/18/2017); Senate Journal 18 |
2017-05-18 | House | Enrolled 05/18/2017 House Journal 16 P. 8 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2017-1659e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 04/27/2017); Senate Journal 16 |
2017-07-26 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2017-1659e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2017 House Journal 15 P. 47 |
2017-05-09 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2017-1659e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2017 |
2017-05-04 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2017 House Journal 15 P. 3 |
2017-04-21 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/04/2017 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 22 P. 4 |
2017-04-21 | House | Executive Session: 04/19/2017 Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-03-22 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/28/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-03-07 | House | Public Hearing: 03/15/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced 02/16/2017 and referred to Education House Journal 8 P. 45 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2017-0501s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/23/2017; Senate Journal 7 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment #2017-0501s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/23/2017; Senate Journal 7 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0501s, 02/23/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Hearing: 01/31/2017, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 8 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 5 |