NH SB104 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-24 - II. Remainder Effective 06/24/13
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-24 - II. Remainder Effective 06/24/13
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission to study the current community-based system of commodities reporting by junk or scrap metal dealers in New Hampshire.
Title
Establishing a commission to study the current community-based system of commodities reporting by junk or scrap metal dealers in New Hampshire.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-24 | Senate | II. Remainder Effective 06/24/13 |
2013-06-24 | Senate | I. Section 2 Effective 11/01/13 |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/24/13; Chapter 0101 |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-05-29 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 45, PG.1527 |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2013-1723e; Adopted (5/2/13) |
2013-05-08 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #1723e Adopted; House Journal 41, PG.1424 |
2013-05-08 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 41, PG.1393 |
2013-05-01 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar36, PG.1201 |
2013-05-01 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for May 8 (Vote 11-7; Regular Calendar); House Calendar36, PG.1201 |
2013-04-10 | House | Executive Session: 4/18/2013 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-04-02 | House | Public Hearing: 4/16/2013 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2013-03-27 | House | Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 31, PG.1074 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0520s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 6 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0520s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-0520s, 3/7/13; Senate Calendar 10 |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Hearing: 2/5/13, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:15 p.m.; Senate Calendar 7 |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4 |