NH SB102 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the determination of underemployment in child support cases.
Title
Relative to the determination of underemployment in child support cases.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Rep. Donald LeBrun [R] | Rep. Peggy McCarthy [R] | Rep. Jack Flanagan [R] |
Rep. Jeffrey Oligny [R] | Sen. David Boutin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-05 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 7 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 3/5/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Hearing:=== RESCHEDULED === 2/3/15, Room 100, State House, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 8 |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Hearing:=== CANCELLED === 1/27/15, Room 100, State House, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 6 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 4 |