NH SB102 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-29 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 45, PG.1525
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-29 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 45, PG.1525
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the selection of members of the conservation commission.
Title
Relative to the selection of members of the conservation commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-29 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 45, PG.1525 |
2013-05-22 | House | Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep Hoell); House Journal 43, PG.1465 |
2013-05-15 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for May 29 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar40, PG.1374 |
2013-04-30 | House | Continued Executive Session: 5/7/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2013-04-24 | House | Executive Session: 4/30/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 ==RECESSED== |
2013-04-09 | House | Public Hearing: 4/17/2013 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2013-03-27 | House | Introduced and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 31, PG.1074 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 6 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Sen. Bradley moved Ought to Pass; Senate Journal 6 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 6 |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 3/7/13; Senate Calendar 10 |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Hearing: 2/13/13, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 8 |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Public & Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4 |