NH SB101 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - Signed by the Governor on 08/10/2021; Chapter 0199; Effective 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - Signed by the Governor on 08/10/2021; Chapter 0199; Effective 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increasing the minimum gross business income required for filing a business profits tax return.
Title
Increasing the minimum gross business income required for filing a business profits tax return.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Senate - Concur (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-16 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 08/10/2021; Chapter 0199; Effective 07/01/2021 |
2021-07-23 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/24/2021 |
2021-07-21 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20 |
2021-07-13 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2021-2050e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Sen. Giuda Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; 06/10/2021; Senate Journal 19 |
2021-06-04 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-1367h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/04/2021 House Journal 9 P. 35 |
2021-06-04 | House | Amendment # 2021-1367h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/04/2021 House Journal 9 P. 35 |
2021-05-20 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1367h (Vote 24-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 26 P. 30 |
2021-05-05 | House | Executive Session: 05/11/2021 09:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91063233087 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-04-28 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 05/04/2021 10:15 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92340576130 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-04-14 | House | Public Hearing: 04/27/2021 09:45 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95145735422 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-03-31 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/25/2021 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 4 P. 51 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/25/2021; Senate Journal 9 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/25/2021; Senate Calendar 16 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/11/2021; Senate Journal 7 |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/11/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 14 |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 02/01/2021, 10:00 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 9 |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Introduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 3 |