NH SB100 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-23 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 12Y-11N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 02/23/2017; Senate Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-23 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 12Y-11N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 02/23/2017; Senate Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Making a general fund appropriation for continuation of the project development phase of the New Hampshire capital rail corridor project.
Title
Making a general fund appropriation for continuation of the project development phase of the New Hampshire capital rail corridor project.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-23 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 12 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-23 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 12Y-11N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 02/23/2017; Senate Journal 7 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 02/23/2017; Senate Calendar 11 |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Hearing: 01/31/2017, Room 103, State House, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 8 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 5 |