NH HR7 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HR7
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 360-233)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-10 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2705h (Vote 11-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-10 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2705h (Vote 11-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Condemning the use of government shutdowns.
Title
Condemning the use of government shutdowns.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-10 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2705h (Vote 11-0; Consent Calendar) |
2019-09-17 | House | Executive Session: 10/02/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2019-07-18 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 08/19/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2019-06-11 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 06/26/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2019-03-06 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-02-12 | House | Executive Session: 03/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2019-02-19 | House | Late Drafting and Introduction Approved by Rules Committee 01/31/2019 |
2019-02-12 | House | Public Hearing: 02/20/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduced 01/31/2019 and referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HR7 (Carry Over) 2019-10-10 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2705h (Vote 11-0; Consent Calendar)