NH HR20 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 28 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-01 - Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 354-6 02/01/2024 House Journal 3 P. 42
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 28 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-01 - Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 354-6 02/01/2024 House Journal 3 P. 42
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reaffirming friendship between New Hampshire and Taiwan, encouraging the enhancement of bilateral trade relations, and supporting Taiwan's international participation.
Title
Reaffirming friendship between New Hampshire and Taiwan, encouraging the enhancement of bilateral trade relations, and supporting Taiwan's international participation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-01 - House - OTP (Y: 354 N: 6 NV: 18 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 354-6 02/01/2024 House Journal 3 P. 42 |
2024-01-31 | House | Removed from Consent (Reps. Moffett, Hobson, Healey, Spillane, Gagne, Rollins, T. Mannion, Lundgren, Edwards, Cambrils) 01/31/2024 |
2024-01-24 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 01/19/2024 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 4 P. 10 |
2024-01-09 | House | Executive Session: 01/19/2024 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2024-01-05 | House | Public Hearing: 01/12/2024 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-11-28 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs |