NH HR17 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on November 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 178-159 03/31/2022 House Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 178-159 03/31/2022 House Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Opposing all federal and state efforts to establish a carbon tax on fuels for electricity and transportation.
Title
Opposing all federal and state efforts to establish a carbon tax on fuels for electricity and transportation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - House - OTP (Y: 178 N: 159 NV: 25 Abs: 28) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 178-159 03/31/2022 House Journal 9 |
2022-01-31 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2022-01-31 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass Majority (Vote 11-10; Regular Calendar) |
2022-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/20/2022 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2021-11-18 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs |