NH HR12 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 63
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging Congress to declare per-fluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances (PFAs) a superfund chemical and provide sufficient programming and funding for education, treatment, and remediation of the effects of PFAS.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging Congress to declare per-fluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances (PFAs) a superfund chemical and provide sufficient programming and funding for education, treatment, and remediation of the effects of PFAS.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 63
2020-03-04HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/11/2020 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 30
2020-01-21HouseExecutive Session: 02/26/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 206
2020-01-21HousePublic Hearing: 01/29/2020 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 206
2020-01-09House==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 01/22/2020 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 206
2019-12-03HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs House Journal 1 P. 33

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback