NH HJR4 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Congress to enact legislation or propose a constitutional amendment to grant statehood to the District of Columbia.
Title
Urging Congress to enact legislation or propose a constitutional amendment to grant statehood to the District of Columbia.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-03-13 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Ley): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 198 |
2020-02-27 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2020-02-27 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/11/2020 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 74 |
2020-02-14 | House | Executive Session: 02/25/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2020-01-21 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 02/19/2020 12:30 pm Legislative Office Building 206 |
2020-01-21 | House | Public Hearing: 01/29/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206 |
2020-01-10 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 01/29/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2020-01-09 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 01/22/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs House Journal 1 P. 33 |