NH HJR2 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 36
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Recommending and requesting the president of the United States and the United States Congress to exclude the state of New Hampshire from offshore oil and gas drilling and exploration activities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recommending and requesting the president of the United States and the United States Congress to exclude the state of New Hampshire from offshore oil and gas drilling and exploration activities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 36
2019-03-08HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/19/2019 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 14
2019-02-12House==RESCHEDULED== Executive Session: 03/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206
2019-01-30House==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 02/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206
2019-01-29House==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 02/06/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206
2019-01-23House==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 01/30/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs House Journal 3 P. 20

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback