NH HCR8 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 20
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 20
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating August 26, 2020 as the 100th anniversary of the 19th Amendment, which guarantees that the right to vote shall not be denied on the basis of sex.
Title
Celebrating August 26, 2020 as the 100th anniversary of the 19th Amendment, which guarantees that the right to vote shall not be denied on the basis of sex.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 20 |
2020-02-26 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/11/2020 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 13 |
2020-01-29 | House | Executive Session: 02/05/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2020-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/21/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Election Law House Journal 1 P. 32 |