NH HCR1 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-25 - Special Order to Regular Calendar of next Session day Without Objection House Journal 4 P. 46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-25 - Special Order to Regular Calendar of next Session day Without Objection House Journal 4 P. 46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to urging Congress to practice fiscal restraint and applying to Congress for a Constitutional Convention for such purpose.
Title
Relative to urging Congress to practice fiscal restraint and applying to Congress for a Constitutional Convention for such purpose.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | House | Special Order to Regular Calendar of next Session day Without Objection House Journal 4 P. 46 |
2021-02-16 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2021-02-16 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 19-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 34 |
2021-02-03 | House | Executive Session: 02/12/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/93009507127 |
2021-01-20 | House | Public Hearing: 01/29/2021 11:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95866113093 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time thecommittee is initially convened. |
2021-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs House Journal 2 P. 46 |