NH HCR1 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 26 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Lay on Table (Rep. Ley): Motion Adopted DV 322-22 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 55
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Rescinding all requests by the New Hampshire legislature for a federal constitutional convention.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rescinding all requests by the New Hampshire legislature for a federal constitutional convention.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07HouseLay on Table (Rep. Ley): Motion Adopted DV 322-22 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 55
2019-02-28HouseSpecial Order to 03/07/2019 Without Objection House Journal 7 P. 62
2019-02-20HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-02-20HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/27/2019 (Vote 8-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 32
2019-02-06HouseExecutive Session: 02/13/2019 12:30 pm Legislative Office Building 303
2019-01-29HousePublic Hearing: 02/06/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 303
2018-12-26HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Legislative Administration House Journal 2 P. 46

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback