NH HB99 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - Signed by Governor Sununu 08/10/2021; Chapter 181; Eff: 01/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - Signed by Governor Sununu 08/10/2021; Chapter 181; Eff: 01/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to seasonal platforms on public waters of the state.
Title
Relative to seasonal platforms on public waters of the state.
Sponsors
Rep. John MacDonald [R] | Rep. William Marsh [D] | Rep. Karel Crawford [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] |
Rep. Brodie Deshaies [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Committee Amendment 1122s (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Committee Amendment 1122s (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-16 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 08/10/2021; Chapter 181; Eff: 01/01/2022 |
2021-07-23 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/24/2021 |
2021-07-21 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20 |
2021-07-12 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2021-2059e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 06/24/2021 |
2021-07-08 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2021-2059e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20 |
2021-06-10 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2021-1122s (Rep. Renzullo): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/10/2021 House Journal 10 P. 17 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-1122s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 04/22/2021; Senate Journal 12 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2021-1122s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Amendment Adopted; 04/22/2021; Senate Journal 12 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1122s, 04/22/2021; Senate Calendar 20 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 03/29/2021, 01:30 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 17 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced 03/04/2021 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 7 |
2021-02-24 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0203h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 15 |
2021-02-24 | House | Amendment # 2021-0203h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 15 |
2021-02-11 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0203h (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 11 |
2021-01-21 | House | Public Hearing: 01/27/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/99531020872 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 2 P. 35 |