NH HB96 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 202-153 02/24/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing the office of school counseling and psychology, establishing the position of school counselor coordinator, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the office of school counseling and psychology, establishing the position of school counselor coordinator, and making an appropriation therefor.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 202-153 02/24/2021
2021-02-12HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2021-02-12HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 17
2021-02-03HouseExecutive Session: 02/09/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98073405784
2021-01-27HousePublic Hearing: 02/02/2021 10:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/99800820017 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-04HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Education House Journal 2 P. 35

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback