NH HB91 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Signed by Governor Sununu 04/13/2017; Chapter 8; Eff. 6/12/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Signed by Governor Sununu 04/13/2017; Chapter 8; Eff. 6/12/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to General John Stark Day.
Title
Relative to General John Stark Day.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 04/13/2017; Chapter 8; Eff. 6/12/2017 |
2017-04-11 | House | Enrolled 04/06/2017 House Journal 13 P. 63 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/06/2017); Senate Journal 14 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/29/2017; Senate Journal 11 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/29/2017; Senate Calendar 16 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Hearing: 03/21/2017, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 15 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Introduced 02/16/2017 and Referred to Election Law and Internal Affairs; Senate Journal 7 |
2017-01-26 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/26/2017 House Journal 4 P. 8 |
2017-01-11 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 01/26/2017 (Vote 15-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 8 P. 6 |
2017-01-11 | House | Executive Session: 01/10/2017 Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-01-04 | House | Public Hearing: 01/10/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2016-12-21 | House | Introduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 2 P. 16 |