NH HB89 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 05/11/2023; Senate Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 05/11/2023; Senate Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to posthumous exonerations.
Title
Relative to posthumous exonerations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-11 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-11 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 05/11/2023; Senate Journal 14 |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 05/11/2023; Senate Calendar 21 |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Hearing: 04/25/2023, Room 100, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 18 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Introduced 03/16/2023 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 11 |
2023-03-16 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0472h: Motion Adopted DV 317-45 03/16/2023 House Journal 9 P. 27 |
2023-03-16 | House | Amendment # 2023-0472h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/16/2023 House Journal 9 P. 27 |
2023-03-03 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0472h 02/10/2023 (Vote 20-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 10 |
2023-02-01 | House | Executive Session: 02/10/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-12-23 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety |