NH HB88 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/17/2021; Chapter 32; Eff: 05/17/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/17/2021; Chapter 32; Eff: 05/17/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the city of Claremont police commission.
Title
Relative to the city of Claremont police commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/17/2021; Chapter 32; Eff: 05/17/2021 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled Regular Calendar 23Y-0N, Motion Adopted, (In recess of 05/06/2021); Senate Journal 15 |
2021-05-06 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 04/09/2021 House Journal 7 P. 102 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 04/22/2021; Senate Journal 12 |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/22/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 20 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 04/12/2021, 09:30 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 19 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Introduced 04/01/2021 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 11 |
2021-04-07 | House | Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50 |
2021-04-07 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 43 |
2021-02-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 20 |
2021-02-02 | House | Executive Session: 02/09/2021 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/93215390740 |
2021-01-27 | House | Public Hearing: 02/08/2021 09:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/96815613466 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 2 P. 34 |