NH HB87 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB87
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-22 - Executive Session: 10/06/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308
Pending: House Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-22 - Executive Session: 10/06/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308
Pending: House Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the definition of electioneering.
Title
Relative to the definition of electioneering.
Sponsors
Rep. John Potucek [R] | Rep. David Binford [R] | Rep. Gregg Hough [R] | Rep. Erica Layon [R] |
Rep. Alan Bershtein [R] | Rep. Alfred Baldasaro [R] | Rep. Aidan Ankarberg [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-22 | House | Executive Session: 10/06/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2021-03-11 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-03-05 | House | Executive Session: 03/05/2021 12:00 pm Please click the link below to join the webinar:https://zoom.us/j/99327579520 |
2021-03-03 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/10/2021 10:10 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/95087806399 (if necessary) |
2021-01-27 | House | Public Hearing: 02/05/2021 09:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/93640014012 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initiallyconvened. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Election Law House Journal 2 P. 34 |
Same As/Similar To
HB87 (Carry Over) 2021-09-22 - Executive Session: 10/06/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308