NH HB85 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/28/2017; Chapter 157; 06/28/17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to installation requirements for arc-fault circuit interrupters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to installation requirements for arc-fault circuit interrupters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-18 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Sen. San born Floor Amendment 1878s (Y: 2 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-29HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 06/28/2017; Chapter 157; 06/28/17
2017-06-13HouseEnrolled 06/08/2017 House Journal 18 P. 9
2017-06-13SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/08/2017); Senate Journal 20
2017-06-01HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 1816s (Rep. McGuire): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 2
2017-05-18SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2017-1816s, Regular Calendar 21Y-1N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/18/2017; Senate Journal 17
2017-05-18SenateSen. Sanborn Floor Amendment #2017-1878s, Regular Calendar 2Y-20N, Amendment Failed; 05/18/2017; Senate Journal 17
2017-05-18SenateSen. Sanborn Withdraws Floor Amendment #2017-1557s; 05/18/2017; Senate Journal 17
2017-05-18SenateSpecial Order HB 85 to the end of the calendar before HB 353, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/18/2017; Senate Journal 17
2017-05-18SenateSen. Sanborn Offered Floor Amendment #2017-1557s; 05/18/2017; Senate Journal 17
2017-05-18SenateSen. Carson Floor Amendment #2017-1816s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/18/2017; Senate Journal 17
2017-05-18SenateCommittee Amendment #2017-1465s, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote; 05/18/2017; Senate Journal 17
2017-05-11SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1465s, 05/18/2017; Senate Calendar 23
2017-05-11SenateSpecial Order HB 85 to the next session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/11/2017; Senate Journal 16
2017-04-27SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1465s, 05/11/2017; Senate Calendar 22
2017-04-27SenateSpecial Order HB 85 to the next session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 04/27/2017; Senate Journal 15
2017-04-27SenateSen. Sanborn Moved to Remove HB 85 from the Consent Calendar; 04/27/2017; Senate Journal 15
2017-04-20SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1465s, 04/27/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 20
2017-04-13SenateHearing: 04/19/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 19
2017-03-14SenateIntroduced 03/09/2017 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 9
2017-03-08HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0016h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 103
2017-03-08HouseAmendment #2017-0016h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 103
2017-03-01HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0016h (NT) for 03/08/2017 (Vote 18-2; Regular Calendar)
2017-02-15HouseExecutive Session: 02/23/2017 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305-307
2017-02-14HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/16/2017 03:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306
2017-02-01House==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/15/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 306
2017-01-11HousePublic Hearing: 01/18/2017 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 306
2016-12-21HouseIntroduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 2 P. 16

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback