NH HB85 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-09 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.324
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the definition of "abutter" for notice of land use board hearings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the definition of "abutter" for notice of land use board hearings.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-02-09 House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.324
2011-02-01 House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 9 (Vote 14-2; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 12, PG.208
2011-01-19 House Executive Session: 1/27/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301
2011-01-11 House ==CANCELLED==Executive Session: 1/18/2011 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 301
2011-01-11 House Public Hearing: 1/18/2011 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301
2010-12-30 House Introduced 1/5/2011 and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 8, PG.129

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback