NH HB83 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-09 - Signed by Governor Sununu 08/04/2023; Chapter 178; eff:10/03/2023 House Journal 17
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-09 - Signed by Governor Sununu 08/04/2023; Chapter 178; eff:10/03/2023 House Journal 17
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to county commissioners' authority on county buildings.
Title
Relative to county commissioners' authority on county buildings.
Sponsors
Rep. Judy Aron [R] | Rep. Skip Rollins [R] | Rep. Carol McGuire [R] | Rep. Walter Stapleton [R] |
Rep. John Cloutier [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-09 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 08/04/2023; Chapter 178; eff:10/03/2023 House Journal 17 |
2023-07-19 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/29/2023 House Journal 17 P. 18 |
2023-07-18 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/29/2023); Senate Journal 20 |
2023-06-15 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2023-1136s (Rep. L. Turcotte): Motion Adopted DV 301-69 06/15/2023 House Journal 16 P. 3 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-1136s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/30/2023; Senate Journal 12 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2023-1136s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/30/2023; Senate Journal 12 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-1136s, 03/30/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 15 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | ==RESCHEDULED== Hearing: 03/21/2023, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:35 am; Senate Calendar 14 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | ==CANCELLED== Hearing: 03/14/2023, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 13 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced 02/22/2023 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 9 |
2023-02-02 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0119h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/02/2023 House Journal 4 |
2023-02-02 | House | Amendment # 2023-0119h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/02/2023 House Journal 4 |
2023-01-30 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0119h 01/25/2023 (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 4 |
2023-01-18 | House | Executive Session: 01/25/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-01-05 | House | Public Hearing: 01/11/2023 02:45 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2022-12-23 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Municipal and County Government |