NH HB83 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-29 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 04/29/2021; Senate Journal 13
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-29 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 04/29/2021; Senate Journal 13
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting non-disparagement clauses in settlement agreements involving a governmental unit.
Title
Prohibiting non-disparagement clauses in settlement agreements involving a governmental unit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 04/29/2021; Senate Journal 13 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 04/29/2021; Senate Calendar 21 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Introduced 04/01/2021 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 11 |
2021-04-07 | House | Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50 |
2021-04-07 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0369h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 37 |
2021-04-07 | House | Amendment # 2021-0369h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 37 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 04/14/2021, 01:00 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 19 |
2021-03-09 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0369h (Vote 20-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 16 |
2021-03-02 | House | Executive Session: 03/02/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95501229688 |
2021-02-23 | House | Public Hearing: 02/23/2021 09:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91815905671 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 2 P. 34 |