NH HB81 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-25 - Lay on Table (Rep. Burt): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 331-17 02/25/2021 House Journal 4 P. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-25 - Lay on Table (Rep. Burt): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 331-17 02/25/2021 House Journal 4 P. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the justified use of deadly force upon another person.
Title
Relative to the justified use of deadly force upon another person.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris True [R] | Rep. Jess Edwards [R] | Rep. Max Abramson [R] | Rep. Bob Greene [R] |
Rep. David Binford [R] | Rep. Alfred Baldasaro [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-26 - House - Table (Y: 331 N: 17 NV: 15 Abs: 35) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Burt): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 331-17 02/25/2021 House Journal 4 P. 2 |
2021-02-16 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2021-02-16 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 11-10; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 25 |
2021-01-28 | House | Public Hearing: 02/05/2021 12:15 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98584313159 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout theday (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 2 P. 34 |