NH HB80 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB80
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on December 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-14 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-14 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the administration of building code enforcement.
Title
Relative to the administration of building code enforcement.
Sponsors
Rep. Carol Roberts [D] | Rep. Mariellen MacKay [R] | Rep. Howard Moffett [D] | Rep. Jeffrey Goley [D] |
Rep. Mariellen MacKay [R] | Rep. John Mann [D] | Rep. Marjorie Shepardson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-14 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) |
2017-10-03 | House | Executive Session: 11/01/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-09-27 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 10/03/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-08-16 | House | Retained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 08/22/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-03-02 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Executive Session: 03/01/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-02-21 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/23/2017 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2017-02-14 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/15/2017 03:00 PM Legislative Office Building 308 |
2017-02-01 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/08/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2017 01:45 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2016-12-21 | House | Introduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 2 P. 16 |
Same As/Similar To
HB80 (Carry Over) 2017-11-14 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar)