NH HB734 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the annual percentage reduction in stabilization grants to school districts.
Title
Relative to the annual percentage reduction in stabilization grants to school districts.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Abbott [D] | Rep. Paul Berch [D] | Rep. John Cloutier [D] | Rep. Cathryn Harvey [D] |
Rep. Timothy Horrigan [D] | Rep. Richard Ames [D] | Sen. Jay Kahn [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 28 |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/19/2019 (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 10 |
2019-02-26 | House | Executive Session: 03/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2019-02-15 | House | Finance-Division II Work Session: 02/20/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2019-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 02/05/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Finance House Journal 3 P. 28 |