NH HB73 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/06/2021; Chapter 17; Eff: 07/05/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to public notice requirements for certain permits issued by the department of environmental services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to public notice requirements for certain permits issued by the department of environmental services.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-10HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 05/06/2021; Chapter 17; Eff: 07/05/2021
2021-04-29SenateEnrolled Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted, (In recess of 04/22/2021); Senate Journal 13
2021-04-29HouseEnrolled (in recess of) 04/09/2021
2021-04-08SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 04/08/2021; Senate Journal 11
2021-03-30SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/08/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 18
2021-03-23SenateRemote Hearing: 03/29/2021, 01:15 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 17
2021-03-04SenateIntroduced 03/04/2021 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 7
2021-02-24HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 7
2021-02-10HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 4
2021-01-20HousePublic Hearing: 01/27/2021 03:15 pm Members of the public may attend using the following links:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92887623403 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-04HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 2 P. 34

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback