NH HB728 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-08 - Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to ranked-choice voting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to ranked-choice voting.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-08HouseCommittee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)
2019-10-04HouseExecutive Session: 10/31/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308
2019-09-18HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 09/24/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307
2019-09-04HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 09/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307
2019-08-16HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 09/05/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308
2019-02-13HouseRetained in Committee
2019-02-06HouseExecutive Session: 02/13/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308
2019-01-23HousePublic Hearing: 01/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308
2019-01-18HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Election Law House Journal 3 P. 28

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback