NH HB725 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/10/2019; Chapter 182; Eff: 09/08/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/10/2019; Chapter 182; Eff: 09/08/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to certain standards for managed care organizations.
Title
Relative to certain standards for managed care organizations.
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry Knirk [D] | Rep. Kermit Williams [D] | Rep. William Marsh [D] | Rep. Gary Woods [D] |
Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/10/2019; Chapter 182; Eff: 09/08/2019 |
2019-06-12 | House | Enrolled 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 47 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/15/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 22 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Hearing: 04/30/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 20 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Introduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-03-07 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0487h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 5 |
2019-03-07 | House | Amendment # 2019-0487h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 5 |
2019-02-26 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0487h (NT) for 03/07/2019 (Vote 19-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 4 |
2019-02-07 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/13/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-02-06 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-29 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/06/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/06/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2019-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 01/30/2019 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 3 P. 28 |