NH HB72 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB72
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 01/05/2022; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 01/05/2022; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to ratification of amendments to the state building code and state fire code.
Title
Relative to ratification of amendments to the state building code and state fire code.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 01/05/2022; Senate Journal 1 |
2021-12-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 01/05/2022; Senate Calendar 49 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; 04/29/2021; Senate Journal 13 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 04/29/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 21 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 04/21/2021, 09:00 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 20 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Introduced 04/01/2021 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 11 |
2021-04-07 | House | Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50 |
2021-04-07 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0304h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 21 |
2021-04-07 | House | Amendment # 2021-0304h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 21 |
2021-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0304h (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 11 |
2021-01-28 | House | Public Hearing: 02/08/2021 01:15 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/99308877767 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 2 P. 34 |
Same As/Similar To
HB72 (Carry Over) 2021-04-29 - Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; 04/29/2021; Senate Journal 13