NH HB71 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0498h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 193-181 04/08/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to school district emergency special meetings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to school district emergency special meetings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-08 - House - OTPA (Y: 193 N: 181 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-08HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-0498h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 193-181 04/08/2021
2021-04-08HouseAmendment # 2021-0498h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/08/2021
2021-03-24HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2021-03-24HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0498h (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 38
2021-02-23HousePublic Hearing: 02/23/2021 02:15 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94382337363 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-04HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Education House Journal 2 P. 34

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback