NH HB71 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - House Signed by Governor 05/16/2011; Effective 07/01/2011; Chapter 0063
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing establishment of pharmaceutical drug take-back programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing establishment of pharmaceutical drug take-back programs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-19 House Signed by Governor 05/16/2011; Effective 07/01/2011; Chapter 0063
2011-05-04 House Enrolled; House Journal 42, PG.1490
2011-05-04 Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 16, Pg.318
2011-04-27 House House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1374s (Rep Reagan): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 40, PG.1352
2011-04-20 Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 13, Pg.270
2011-04-20 Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1374s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 13, Pg.265
2011-04-20 Senate Committee Amendment 1374s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 13, Pg.265
2011-04-08 Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-1374s, 4/20/11; Senate Calendar 20
2011-03-24 Senate Hearing: 4/7/11, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 1:20 p.m.; Senate Calendar 17
2011-03-23 Senate Introduced and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 11, Pg.190
2011-03-15 House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.715
2011-03-04 House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 15 (Vote 11-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.531
2011-02-24 House Full Committee Work Session: 3/3/2011 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 ==Executive Session To Follow==
2011-02-22 House ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 3/3/2011 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205
2011-02-09 House Recommit (Rep Reagan): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.323-324
2011-01-26 House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Feb 9 (Vote 17-0; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 10, PG.150
2011-01-20 House Executive Session: 1/25/2011 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 205
2011-01-11 House Subcommittee Work Session: 1/19/2011 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 205
2011-01-04 House Public Hearing: 1/11/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205
2010-12-30 House Introduced 1/5/2011 and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs; House Journal 8, PG.129

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback