NH HB709 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB709
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 123
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 123
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the formula for determining funding for an adequate education.
Title
Relative to the formula for determining funding for an adequate education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 123 |
2019-11-14 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 50 P. 24 |
2019-10-02 | House | Executive Session: 11/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2019-10-02 | House | Division II Work Session: 10/29/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2019-03-27 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-03-22 | House | Executive Session: 03/27/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2019-03-06 | House | Finance Division II Work Session: 03/13/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 209 |
2019-02-28 | House | Finance Division II Work Session: 03/04/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Finance 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 82 |
2019-02-27 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0526h and 2019-0693h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 262-82 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 80 |
2019-02-27 | House | FLAM # 2019-0693h (Rep. Luneau): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 79 |
2019-02-27 | House | Amendment # 2019-0526h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 77 |
2019-02-20 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0526h for 02/27/2019 (Vote 17-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 19 |
2019-02-12 | House | Executive Session: 02/19/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-02-06 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/13/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-01-30 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-01-30 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/05/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 01/29/2019 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 27 |
Same As/Similar To
HB709 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Regular Calendar)