NH HB705 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB705
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-15 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2806h (Vote 17-3; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-15 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2806h (Vote 17-3; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increasing the cap on assistance for victims of crime and relative to the rights of victims of crime.
Title
Increasing the cap on assistance for victims of crime and relative to the rights of victims of crime.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-15 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2806h (Vote 17-3; Regular Calendar) |
2019-10-02 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/16/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-10-02 | House | Executive Session: 10/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2019-10-02 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 10/23/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-09-12 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/24/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-09-11 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/02/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-06-27 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/11/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-06-26 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/18/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-06-18 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 06/26/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-02-21 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-02-12 | House | ==TIME CHANGE== Executive Session: 02/21/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-02-12 | House | Public Hearing: 02/20/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 3 P. 27 |
Same As/Similar To
HB705 (Carry Over) 2019-11-15 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2806h (Vote 17-3; Regular Calendar)