NH HB696 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on July 12 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Enrolled 06/27/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a protective order for vulnerable adults.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a protective order for vulnerable adults.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - House - Adopt CofC Report (Y: 199 N: 143 NV: 25 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - OTP (Y: 219 N: 156 NV: 5 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - OTPA (Y: 208 N: 132 NV: 29 Abs: 31) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-12HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019
2019-07-10SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-27HouseConference Committee Report 2523c: Adopted, Regular Calendar 199-143 06/27/2019
2019-06-27SenateConference Committee Report # 2019-2523c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/27/2019; Senate Journal 21
2019-06-20SenateConference Committee Report Filed, # 2019-2523c; 06/27/2019
2019-06-14SenateConferee Change; Senator Chandley Replaces Senator Levesque; Senate Journal 21
2019-06-13HouseConference Committee Meeting: 06/17/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2019-06-12SenatePresident Appoints: Senators Hennessey, Levesque, French; (In Recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20
2019-06-12SenateSen. Hennessey Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; (In recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20
2019-06-12HouseSpeaker Appoints: Reps. Welch, Cushing, Weber, R. Osborne 06/06/2019
2019-06-12HouseHouse Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1968s and Requests CofC (Rep. Weber): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/06/2019
2019-05-23SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1968s, Regular Calendar 13Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17
2019-05-23SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-1968s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17
2019-05-23SenateSpecial Order to the beginning of the regular calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17
2019-05-14SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1968s, 05/23/2019; Senate Calendar 23
2019-05-02SenateHearing: 05/07/2019, Room 100, State House, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 21
2019-04-12SenateIntroduced 04/11/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 13
2019-04-04HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 219-156 04/04/2019 House Journal 12 P. 13
2019-04-04HouseLay on Table (Rep. Welch): Motion Failed DV 164-211 04/04/2019 House Journal 12 P. 13
2019-03-28HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-03-28HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/04/2019 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 4
2019-03-06HouseExecutive Session: 03/27/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2019-03-06House==ROOM CHANGE== Public Hearing: 03/26/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208
2019-02-27HouseReferred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 91
2019-02-27HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0395h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 208-132 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 85
2019-02-27HouseAmendment # 2019-0395h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 85
2019-02-13HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0395h for 02/27/2019 (Vote 22-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 20
2019-02-06House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/12/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2019-02-06HouseDivision II Subcommittee Work Session: 02/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-01-30House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/05/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2019-01-30HouseDivision II Subcommittee Work Session: 02/05/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-01-23HousePublic Hearing: 01/30/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2019-01-17HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 3 P. 26

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=14&sy=2019&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=HB696
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&id=14&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=14
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=14
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=52&sy=2019&lb=H&eb=HB0696&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=HB696&ddlsponsors=&lsr=14
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=148&sy=2019&lb=H&eb=HB0696&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=HB696&ddlsponsors=&lsr=14
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=157&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=HB0696&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=HB696&ddlsponsors=&lsr=14
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=246&sy=2019&lb=H&eb=HB0696&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=HB696&ddlsponsors=&lsr=14

Bill Comments

feedback