NH HB691 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 241-117 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 43
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 241-117 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 43
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to blood testing for individuals exposed to perfluorinated chemicals in private or public water supplies.
Title
Relative to blood testing for individuals exposed to perfluorinated chemicals in private or public water supplies.
Sponsors
Rep. Wendy Thomas [D] | Rep. Nancy Murphy [D] | Rep. Kathryn Stack [D] | Rep. David Meuse [D] |
Sen. Shannon Chandley [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - House - ITL (Y: 241 N: 117 NV: 19 Abs: 23) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 241-117 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 43 |
2019-02-27 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/07/2019 (Vote 16-5; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 13 |
2019-02-20 | House | Executive Session: 02/26/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-02-20 | House | Division II Subcommittee Work Session: 02/26/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-02-13 | House | Division II Subcommittee Work Session: 02/19/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-01-30 | House | Public Hearing: 02/06/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 3 P. 26 |