NH HB69 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-03 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/30/2021; Chapter 161; Eff: 09/28/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-03 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/30/2021; Chapter 161; Eff: 09/28/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the authority of schools to display the national and state mottos.
Title
Relative to the authority of schools to display the national and state mottos.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris True [R] | Rep. Max Abramson [R] | Rep. Bob Greene [R] | Rep. Tony Piemonte [R] |
Rep. Peter Torosian [R] | Rep. Deborah Hobson [R] | Rep. Beth Folsom [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - House - Concur (Y: 211 N: 150 NV: 8 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - OTP (Y: 204 N: 169 NV: 25 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - OTP (Y: 204 N: 169 NV: 25 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-03 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/30/2021; Chapter 161; Eff: 09/28/2021 |
2021-07-15 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/24/2021 |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20 |
2021-06-10 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2021-1465s (Rep. Ladd): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 211-150 06/10/2021 House Journal 10 P. 4 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-1465s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/13/2021; Senate Journal 15 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Sen. Giuda Floor Amendment # 2021-1465s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/13/2021; Senate Journal 15 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Sen. Giuda Moved Ought to Pass; 05/13/2021; Senate Journal 15 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; 05/13/2021; Senate Journal 15 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Sen. Giuda Moved to Remove HB 69 from the Consent Calendar; 05/13/2021; Senate Journal 15 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 05/13/2021; Senate Calendar 23 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 04/20/2021, 09:00 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 20 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Introduced 04/08/2021 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 12 |
2021-04-08 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 204-169 04/08/2021 House Journal 6 P. 9 |
2021-03-25 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation (Vote ; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 37 |
2021-03-11 | House | Executive Session: 03/11/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95090800832 |
2021-03-02 | House | Public Hearing: 03/02/2021 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/97910276071 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Education House Journal 2 P. 34 |