NH HB688 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - Lay on Table (Rep. Bixby): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 84
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to transfer and inspection of animals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to transfer and inspection of animals.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27HouseLay on Table (Rep. Bixby): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 84
2019-02-21HouseCommittee Report: Without Recommendation for 02/27/2019 (Vote ; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 19
2019-02-06House==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 02/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303
2019-01-30HousePublic Hearing: 02/07/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303
2019-01-17HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 3 P. 26

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback