NH HB688 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2016 House Journal 4 P. 50
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2016 House Journal 4 P. 50
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to establishing an agricultural education number plate.
Title
Relative to establishing an agricultural education number plate.
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Bixby [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2016 House Journal 4 P. 50 |
2015-11-12 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 (Vote 11-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 11 |
2015-09-21 | House | Executive Session: 9/29/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-05-13 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 5/20/2015 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-03-03 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-02-10 | House | Executive Session: 3/3/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-02-10 | House | Public Hearing: 3/3/2015 11:40 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Transportation; House Journal 12, PG. 235 |