NH HB686 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Retained in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to calculating and funding the interim cost of an opportunity for an adequate education and extending the interest and dividends tax to capital gains.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to calculating and funding the interim cost of an opportunity for an adequate education and extending the interest and dividends tax to capital gains.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - House - OTPA (Y: 199 N: 143 NV: 13 Abs: 45) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - Table (Y: 139 N: 203 NV: 14 Abs: 44) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseRetained in Committee
2019-03-22HouseExecutive Session: 03/27/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2019-03-06HouseFinance Division II Work Session: 03/13/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 209
2019-02-28HouseFinance Division II Work Session: 03/04/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 209
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Finance 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 37
2019-02-28HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0404h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 199-143 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 35
2019-02-28HouseLay on Table (Rep. Steven Smith): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 139-203 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 33
2019-02-28HouseAmendment # 2019-0404h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 29
2019-02-20HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-02-20HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0404h for 02/27/2019 (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 26
2019-02-06HouseExecutive Session: 02/12/2019 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202
2019-01-31HouseFull Committee Work Session: 02/07/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2019-01-23HousePublic Hearing: 01/29/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2019-01-16HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 3 P. 26

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback