NH HB681 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 7/13/2015; Chapter 244; Effective Date 7/1/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 7/13/2015; Chapter 244; Effective Date 7/1/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a fine for persons convicted of domestic violence and increasing the marriage license fee.
Title
Establishing a fine for persons convicted of domestic violence and increasing the marriage license fee.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Cushing [D] | Rep. Latha Mangipudi [D] | Sen. Donna Soucy [D] | Rep. Suzanne Harvey [D] |
Rep. Alexis Simpson [D] | Rep. Laura Pantelakos [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-24 - House - Adopt CofC Report (Y: 203 N: 144 NV: 23 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Senate - Sections 2 and 3 (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Senate - Sections 1 and 3 (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Senate - Sen. Sanborn Floor Amendment 1702s (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - Ought to Pass (Y: 223 N: 146 NV: 28 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 170 N: 199 NV: 28 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-05-14 - Senate - Sections 2 and 3 (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Senate - Sections 1 and 3 (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Senate - Sen. Sanborn Floor Amendment 1702s (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - Ought to Pass (Y: 223 N: 146 NV: 28 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 170 N: 199 NV: 28 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-15 | House | Signed by the Governor on 7/13/2015; Chapter 244; Effective Date 7/1/2015 |
2015-07-02 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 6/24/2015); House Journal 54, PG. 2141 |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 6/24/2015); Senate Journal 19 |
2015-06-24 | House | Conference Committee Report 2225c: Adopted, Regular Calendar 203-144; House Journal 54, PG. 2133-2135 |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 2225c; Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 19 |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Conference Committee Report #2015-2225c; Senate Amendment + New Amendment, Filed |
2015-06-09 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 6/16/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Boutin, Carson, and Feltes |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Sen. Boutin Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 17 |
2015-06-03 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps Lachance, Abrami, Almy, Gallagher; House Journal 44, PG. 1815 |
2015-06-03 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendments #1702s, #1760s, and #1763s and Requests Committee of Conference (Rep Major): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG. 1815 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 1702s, New Title, 1760s, New Title, and 1763s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 14 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Sections 2 and 3, Regular Calendar 21Y-3N, Motion Adopted |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Sections 1 and 3, Regular Calendar 20Y-4N, Motion Adopted |
2015-05-14 | Senate | The Chair ruled the Question Divisible |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved to Divide the Question Sections 1 and 3 and 2 and 3; Senate Journal 14 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment #2015-1763s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 14 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Sen. Carson Floor Amendment #2015-1760s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 14 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Sen. Sanborn Floor Amendment #2015-1702s, New Title, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Amendment Adopted; Senate Journal 14 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Special Order HB 681-FN-A to the end of the calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 14 |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/14/15; Senate Calendar 21 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Hearing: 4/7/15, Room 103, State House, 10:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 16 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 223-146; House Journal 24, PG. 820-822 |
2015-03-11 | House | Floor Amendment #2015-0826h (Rep Sanborn): Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 170-199; House Journal 24, PG. 817-820 |
2015-03-06 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 11 (Vote 20-1; Regular Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 411-412 |
2015-02-25 | House | Executive Session: 3/3/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-02-20 | House | Continued Public Hearing: 3/2/2015 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-02-11 | House | Public Hearing: 2/20/2015 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202=RECESSED= |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 12, PG. 235 |