NH HB680 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-14 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the definition of tobacco product for purposes of the tobacco tax and retail tobacco licensing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the definition of tobacco product for purposes of the tobacco tax and retail tobacco licensing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - House - OTPA (Y: 203 N: 153 NV: 11 Abs: 33) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-14HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar)
2019-10-22HouseFull Committee Work Session: 11/05/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202
2019-10-16HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 10/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203
2019-10-15HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 10/23/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2019-10-02HouseExecutive Session: 11/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2019-10-02HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 10/15/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2019-10-02HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 10/01/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2019-09-11HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 09/26/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2019-09-04HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 09/10/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202
2019-03-27HouseRetained in Committee
2019-03-20HouseFull Committee Work Session: 03/26/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2019-03-19HouseExecutive Session: 03/27/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2019-03-19House==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 03/26/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 203
2019-03-19House==TIME CHANGE== Subcommittee Work Session: 03/25/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2019-03-19HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 03/22/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 204
2019-03-13HouseFull Committee Work Session: 03/18/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202
2019-03-06HousePublic Hearing: 03/13/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202
2019-02-27HouseReferred to Ways and Means 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 33
2019-02-27HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0501h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 203-153 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 28
2019-02-27HouseAmendment # 2019-0477h (NT): Amendment Failed DV 143-211 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 28
2019-02-27HouseAmendment # 2019-0501h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 28
2019-02-20HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0477h (NT)
2019-02-20HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0501h for 02/27/2019 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 16
2019-02-07HouseExecutive Session: 02/13/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2019-02-06HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-01-30HousePublic Hearing: 02/07/2019 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2019-01-16HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 3 P. 25

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback