NH HB677 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-11 - Subcommittee Work Session: 09/24/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
Hearing: Sep 24 @ 9:00 am in Legislative Office Building 207
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to discipline of students, addressing students' behavioral needs, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to discipline of students, addressing students' behavioral needs, and making an appropriation therefor.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-11HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 09/24/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
2019-08-05HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 09/11/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
2019-02-13HouseRetained in Committee
2019-02-06House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/12/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 207
2019-01-30House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/05/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
2019-01-23House==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 01/30/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
2019-01-23House==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 01/29/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
2019-01-16HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 25

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback