NH HB677 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-18 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 216-142; House Journal 20, PG. 517-519
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting the use of public funds for abortion services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting the use of public funds for abortion services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-18 - House - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 216 N: 142 NV: 40 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-18HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 216-142; House Journal 20, PG. 517-519
2015-02-12HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2015-02-12HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 18 (Vote 14-3; Regular Calendar); House Calendar13, PG. 247
2015-02-05HouseExecutive Session: 2/12/2015 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208
2015-02-04HousePublic Hearing: 2/10/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205
2015-01-08HouseIntroduced and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 12, PG. 235

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback