NH HB67 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 23Y-0N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 05/06/2021; Senate Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to warrant articles in official ballot town, school district, or village district meetings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to warrant articles in official ballot town, school district, or village district meetings.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-06SenateInexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 23Y-0N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 05/06/2021; Senate Journal 14
2021-04-27SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 05/06/2021; Senate Calendar 22
2021-04-21SenateRemote Hearing: 04/26/2021, 10:00 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 21
2021-04-13SenateIntroduced 04/08/2021 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 12
2021-04-09HouseOught to Pass with Amendment : Motion Adopted DV 193-181 04/09/2021 House Journal 7 P. 23
2021-04-09HouseAmendment # 2021-0553h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/09/2021 House Journal 7 P. 23
2021-03-09HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2021-03-09HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0553h (Vote 10-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 55
2021-02-18HouseExecutive Session: 02/18/2021 01:30 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94522837794
2021-02-02HousePublic Hearing: 02/09/2021 10:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/93215390740 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-04HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 2 P. 34

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback