NH HB669 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Law Without Signature 07/11/2019; Chapter 205; Eff: 01/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to gender identity information included on drivers' licenses and nondrivers' identification cards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to gender identity information included on drivers' licenses and nondrivers' identification cards.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-15HouseLaw Without Signature 07/11/2019; Chapter 205; Eff: 01/01/2020
2019-06-12HouseEnrolled 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 47
2019-06-12SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20
2019-05-23HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 1853s (Rep. Sykes): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 11
2019-05-15SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1853s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
2019-05-15SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-1853s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
2019-05-07SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1853s, 05/15/2019; Senate Calendar 22
2019-04-04SenateHearing: 04/09/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 02:15 pm; Senate Calendar 17
2019-04-01SenateIntroduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 12
2019-03-20HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 62
2019-03-12HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/19/2019 (Vote 15-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 37
2019-02-27HouseExecutive Session: 03/11/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203
2019-02-26HousePublic Hearing: 03/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203
2019-01-16HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Transportation House Journal 3 P. 24

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback