NH HB669 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 245-110; House Journal 24, PG. 859-861
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring law enforcement agencies to report on the receipt of certain equipment and grants from the federal government and on the deployment of tactical teams.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring law enforcement agencies to report on the receipt of certain equipment and grants from the federal government and on the deployment of tactical teams.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-11 - House - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 245 N: 110 NV: 42 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-11HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 245-110; House Journal 24, PG. 859-861
2015-03-05HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2015-03-05HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 11 (Vote 11-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 419
2015-02-25HouseExecutive Session: 3/2/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
2015-02-11HousePublic Hearing: 2/17/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
2015-01-08HouseIntroduced and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 12, PG. 234

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback